BANGLADESH ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
very near future we are going to take collection for our centre and without this charity registration number or without joining the charity organisation we can't do that.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2019
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 01 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAFIZ SADIOUR RAHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD SULEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAHAB UDDIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NOUR KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2015 | 01/01/2016 | 01/01/2017 | 01/01/2018 | 01/01/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.70k | £9.50k | £9.20k | £9.50k | £8.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.35k | £9.00k | £9.00k | £9.20k | £9.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1285 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1285 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1650 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1650 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING MOTHER TONGUE LANGUAGES, ARABIC AND ISLAMIC STUDIES BY PROVIDING CLASSES IN THESE TOPICS AND BY ESTABLISHING A LIBRARY AND; THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE HOLY QURAN AND WARDS BY PROVIDING DAILY PRAYERS AN ADVISORY SERVICE, FUNERAL SERVICES AND ESTABLISHING MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELATED SERVICES THAT THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 MAYFIELD ROAD
HANDSWORTH
BIRMINGHAM
B19 1RL
- Phone:
- 01215519706
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window