THE PHOENIX SNAK SHAK LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a Youth Drop-In Centre as a safe and secure place for the Youth of Selsey to meet
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 12 December 2007: Standard registration
- 26 March 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.88k | £15.43k | £56.79k | £11.08k | £20.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.62k | £18.70k | £26.89k | £22.97k | £24.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 01 October 2019 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 23 July 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE MANHOOD PENINSULA AREA, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, NOT CURRENTLY IN CONTACT WITH EXISTING YOUTH PROVISIONS, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
WEST SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window