SOUTHSIDE YOUNG LEADERS ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leadership training for African and Caribbean boys aged 8 - 18. Saturday Academy offers study support, personal development, sports, drill and practical skills. Holiday activities include visits to businesses and institutions, arts and skills training, residential programmes. The Parents' Forum offering counseling and practical on parenting issues. Boys supported in school during week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
- Southwark
Governance
- 28 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dhosjan Greenaway-Dalini | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Justice Allotey | Trustee | 12 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alfred Ayisi | Trustee | 12 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ansumana Bai-Marrow | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valentina Nnennaya Okoro | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Max Woodbridge | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Johnstone | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caren Onanda | Trustee | 22 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Winston Davis | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.17k | £208.29k | £241.61k | £164.48k | £196.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.58k | £170.68k | £228.42k | £150.80k | £253.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 July 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 July 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 14 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | 14 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 APRIL 2007 as amended on 24 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR YOUNG MALES OF AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN ORIGIN, BETWEEN THE AGES OF EIGHT AND EIGHTEEN BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING (INCLUDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING) FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHILDREN SO THAT THEY MAY DEVELOP THEIR CAPACITIES TO ACT AS ACTIVE CITIZENS AND THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK AND LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Walworth Academy Upper School
Shorncliffe Road
LONDON
SE1 5UJ
- Phone:
- 02077019055
- Email:
- info@syla.org.uk
- Website:
-
syla.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window