Accounts and annual returns WOODARD ACADEMIES TRUST

Charity Number: 1122096
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 09 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 23 February 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 30 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 14 April 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2008 16 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 15 October 2008 On Time