CUDDLES CATS RESCUE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cuddles Cat Rescue takes in unwanted cats and kittens including strays. Cares for them, neuters them where necessary and re homes them to suitable persons. Raises funds to pay for vets bills,food,litter and other associated costs. Educates the public in caring for their cats.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 09 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Burrell | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Jones | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anne Jones | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Wedlake | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
LYNN WEDLAKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2019 | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.05k | £23.78k | £21.30k | £14.80k | £17.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.94k | £19.92k | £14.83k | £29.34k | £22.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 17 October 2022 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF CATS IN THE NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE AREA WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, NEGLECT OR MALTREATMENT BY THE PROVISION OF A RESCUE AND RE-HOMING SERVICE AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC SO THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO LOOK AFTER CATS AND KITTENS
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 WILTON ROAD
HUMBERSTON
GRIMSBY
DN36 4AW
- Phone:
- 01472230530
- Email:
- cuddlescatsrescue@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window