INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MILD APPROACHES IN ASSISTED REPRODUCTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running of international conferences with leading academics and practitioners providing a cutting edge educational programme to provide scientific evidence on mild approaches to assisted reproduction and related topics. 1. Training and educational programmes. 2. Scientific research. 3. Newsletter - o develop into a peer reviewed journal.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of London
Governance
- 15 April 2008: Standard registration
- ISMAAR (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR STUART CAMPBELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
Professor Geeta Nargund | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £720 | £4.67k | £1.03k | £900 | £900 | |
|
Total expenditure | £720 | £4.67k | £1.03k | £900 | £900 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF WOMEN A BY PROMOTING EFFECTIVE APPROACHES TO ASSISTED REPRODUCTION WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON THOSE APPROACHES THAT WORK MOST CLOSELY WITH THE PATIENT'S NATURAL CYCLE AND EMPHASISE MINIMAL STIMULATION PROTOCOLS. B THROUGH THE PREVENTION OF INFERTILITY AND THE PROTECTION OF FERTILITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ACCOUNTANCY HOUSE
90 WALWORTH ROAD
LONDON
SE1 6SW
- Phone:
- 02077037594
- Email:
- info@ismaar.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window