Accounts and annual returns 2020 PUBLIC SERVICES TRUST
Charity number: 1124095
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 22 March 2011 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 22 March 2011 | 50 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 05 July 2010 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 30 October 2009 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window