Financial history HIGHFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION-KEIGHLEY

Charity number: 1124828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £217.51k £362.23k £274.54k £295.61k £418.01k
Total expenditure £252.79k £278.77k £298.13k £307.98k £385.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.57k N/A £109.86k £128.09k £133.35k