HIGHFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION-KEIGHLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Further develop and benefit residents of Keighley, specifically neighbourhood of Highfield. By associating together residents, local authorities, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation, leisure time occupation with the objective of improving conditions of life for residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £133,347 from 8 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 03 July 2008: Standard registration
- HIGHFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (KEIGHLEY) (Previous name)
- HIGHFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Javaid Iqbal | Chair | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sugheer Hussain Zeb | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shabana Din | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roy Williams | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Diane Ramsden | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £217.51k | £362.23k | £274.54k | £295.61k | £418.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £252.79k | £278.77k | £298.13k | £307.98k | £385.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £34.57k | N/A | £109.86k | £128.09k | £133.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JULY 2002 AND 12 JUNE 2008 AS AMENDED ON 06 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED ON 12 JUN 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 OCT 2019 as amended on 12 Jun 2008 as amended on 30 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
FURTHER DEVELOP AND BENEFIT RESIDENTS OF KEIGHLEY SPECIFICALLY THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF HIGHFIELD. WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER RESIDENTS, LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION, LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR RESIDENTS. TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE IN HIGHFIELD FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES.
Area of benefit
FIT RESIDENTS OF KEIGHLEY SPECIFICALLY THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF HIGHFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGHFIELD COMMUNITY CENTRE
21 DREWRY ROAD
KEIGHLEY
BD21 2QG
- Phone:
- 01535608900
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window