GWENT HAWK RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
educating the public; caring for birds of prey
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 19 April 2008: Standard registration
- 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 November 2015: Re-registered
- 08 September 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 08 September 2023: Funds transferred to 1092349 HAWK CONSERVANCY TRUST LIMITED
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £21.87k | £0 | £364.88k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.11k | £12.68k | £21.56k | £47.43k | £4.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 22 JULY 2007 as amended on 06 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF BIRDS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH BIRDS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, MONMOUTHSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window