THE DONALD GORDON THIRD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scientific, medical and technological research and education; relief of poverty; promotion and support of the arts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- South Africa
Governance
- 19 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Abraham Abel | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Susan Hode Tager | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Nicholas James Appelbaum | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Terra Nova Trustees (Pty) Limited | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Wendy Appelbaum | Trustee | 31 December 2018 |
|
|||||||
Graeme Gordon | Trustee | 31 December 2018 |
|
|||||||
ANTON STERNBERG | Trustee |
|
||||||||
HYLTON IRA APPELBAUM | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.35k | £2.93k | £5.57k | £7.00m | £334.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.35k | £2.93k | £9.08k | £17.49k | £374.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.00m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.00m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £17.49k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.94k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 29 December 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED (DATED) 14 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT PROMOTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF AND ASSISTANCE WITH SCIENTIFIC MEDICAL AND TECHNOLOGICAL RESEARCH AND EDUCATION IN THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA AND THE PRACTICE OF MEDICINE IN THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA: 3.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG THE PUBLIC IN THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA; 3.3 THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF THE ARTS IN THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA; AND 3.4 ANY OTHER PURPOSE OR PURPOSES WHICH IT COULD LAWFULLY UNDERTAKE AS A PUBLIC BENEFIT ORGANISATION IN SOUTH AFRICA AS CONTAINED IN PART 1 OF THE NINTH SCHEDULE TO THE ACT AND AS A CHARITY REGISTERED WITH THE CHARITY COMMISSION IN ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stonehage Fleming
6 St James's Square
London
SW1Y 4JU
- Phone:
- 02070870000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window