Financial history CALVARY CHAPEL EAST DULWICH LIMITED

Charity number: 1122053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £15.18k £17.05k £26.93k £19.15k £19.44k
Total expenditure £15.03k £16.11k £21.68k £22.06k £25.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A