FRIENDS OF LITTLE THETFORD SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 04 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Desiree Ayton | Chair | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor May Hudson | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Eleanor Louise Weaver | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Jane Rivers | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Sheila Frances Argent | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Owens | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Sycamore | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Disney | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Calleja | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Katie Robinson | Trustee | 04 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2019 | 30/08/2020 | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.84k | £2.51k | £4.27k | £6.14k | £14.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.61k | £1.68k | £6.44k | £5.23k | £9.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL ION PARTICULAR BY 2.1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Hertford Close
ELY
Cambridgeshire
CB6 3QS
- Phone:
- 01353649260
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window