Accounts and annual returns THE JOE GEELING TRUST

Charity number: 1121741
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 June 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 03 June 2011 18 June 2012 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2011 Not Required
Annual return 03 June 2010 14 April 2011 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2010 Not Required
Annual return 03 June 2009 19 August 2010 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2009 20 April 2010 17 days late