THE JOE GEELING TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, protect, relieve and preserve the physical and mental health sufferers of Cystic Fibrosis by supporting the work of the Cystic Fibrosis Trust and The New Children's Hospital Manchester
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 June 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Manchester City
Governance
- 29 November 2007: Standard registration
- 06 March 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/06/2008 | 03/06/2009 | 03/06/2010 | 03/06/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.36k | £30.16k | £13.19k | £12.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.05k | £125.48k | £10.38k | £15.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 June 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 03 June 2011 | 18 June 2012 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 June 2010 | 14 April 2011 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 June 2009 | 19 August 2010 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2009 | 20 April 2010 | 17 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
3. APPLICATION OF INCOME THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS"): (I) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF CYSTIC FIBROSIS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE; (II) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH CYSTIC FIBROSIS BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF THE CYSTIC FIBROSIS TRUST; (III) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SICK CHILDREN WITH CYSTIC FIBROSIS AND OTHER CONDITIONS AND THE FAMILIES OF THOSE CHILDREN BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF BOOTH HALL CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL AND ITS SUCCESSOR, THE NEW CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, MANCHESTER, PROVIDING SUCH SUPPORT IS IN AUGMENTATION OF THAT PROVIDED BY THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE; AND (IV) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO CYSTIC FIBROSIS.
Area of benefit
NATIONALLY, PARTICULARLY IN THE MANCHESTER AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window