DOVETAIL COMMUNITY OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity works with the community for improvements with: Older people, Youth, Family, Health, Unemployed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 03 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Martin Platt | Chair | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Ann Cann | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raymond John Wadham | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW LOMATH | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|||||
MRS JUDITH HAZELGROVE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.56k | £39.86k | £41.06k | £36.97k | £40.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.98k | £38.46k | £50.21k | £50.84k | £48.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.72k | £27.64k | £20.00k | £15.00k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF THE DEVELOPMENT OF COMMUNITY CARE INCLUDING WORKING TOGETHER WITH HILLINGDON PARK BAPTIST CHURCH VOLUNTARY CHARITABLE AGENCIES PRIMARY CARE TRUSTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES TO SUPPORT YOUNG PEOPLE THE ELDERLY AND THOSE WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED AND TO ADDRESS OTHER IDENTIFIED NEEDS IN THE COMMUNITY AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST
Area of benefit
HILLINGDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILLINGDON PARK BAPTIST CHURCH
25 HERCIES ROAD
UXBRIDGE
UB10 9LS
- Phone:
- 01895814424
- Email:
- dovetail@hillypark.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window