SMALL PET & CAT CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RESCUE,REHABILITATION & PERMANENT RE-HOMING OF MISTREATED CATS & OTHER SMALL PETS TO OFFER SANCTUARY & CARE TO UNWANTED ANIMALS THE ALLEVIATION & PREVENTION OF SUFFERING CAUSED TO ANY ANIMAL BY ILLNESS,NEGLECT OR POOR CIRCUMSTANCES PROVIDE VETERINARY CARE,PREVENTATIVE TREATMENTS,VACCINATIONS & ADEQUATE NUTRITION TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC & ENCOURAGE HIGH STANDARDS OF CARE TO PREVENT SUFFERING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 14 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENNETH ALWYN WEATHERILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EILEEN HOLDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK WEATHERILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.89k | £9.14k | £14.28k | £12.80k | £18.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.88k | £10.94k | £13.47k | £13.54k | £15.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 MOORFOOT CLOSE
BRANSHOLME
HULL
HU7 5AE
- Phone:
- 01482823090
- Email:
- specc@specc.karoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window