HOOLE ENTERPRISE TRUST - TIME FOR YOU (HETTY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide education and care services including lunch club, holiday care and other activities in line with the aims and objectives of HETTY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 01 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Jones | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Panagakis | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Bowes | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £434.37k | £382.71k | £415.19k | £483.14k | £447.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £409.92k | £413.74k | £413.85k | £448.60k | £513.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £192.06k | N/A | £240.21k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 September 2023 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 September 2023 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2020
(These accounts |
08 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2019
(These accounts |
11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION OR MEANS; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSISTING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE; AND (D) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES AND OPERATING SERVICES, NOT RESTRICTED TO NORMAL SCHOOL HOURS, AND WHICH ARE NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED FOR BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY BUT WHICH CREATE AND FOSTER OPPORTUNITIES FOR SAID CHILDREN, PARENTS AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY IN WHICH THEY LIVE TO PARTICIPATE, IN AND ACCESS EDUCATIONAL, LEARNING AND RECREATIONAL RESOURCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN RACTICE: LOCALLY IN CHESHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOOLE C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
HOOLE LANE
CHESTER
CH2 3HB
- Phone:
- 01244678905
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window