LEE FAIR SHARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop the local community's skills, self-confidence and capacity and in particular people disadvantaged socially and/or economically, who live in the Lee and Hither Green areas of the London Borough of Lewisham. The Charity encourages general activities in mutual volunteering, befriending and social events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 April 2024
Total income includes £4,678 from 2 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lewisham
Governance
- 22 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Maggs | Chair | 13 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES ELIZABETH MIGNIUOLO | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/04/2020 | 03/04/2021 | 03/04/2022 | 03/04/2023 | 03/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.63k | £19.63k | £13.61k | £5.65k | £23.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.85k | £10.85k | £6.80k | £12.66k | £13.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £425 | £425 | £290 | N/A | £4.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 April 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED 10 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP THE LOCAL COMMUNITY'S SKILLS, SELF-CONFIDENCE AND CAPACITY, AND IN PARTICULAR PEOPLE DISADVANTAGED SOCIALLY AND/OR ECONOMICALLY, WHO LIVE IN THE HITHER GREEN AND LEE GREEN AREAS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM. THAT WILL BE DONE IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. THE CHARITY WILL CARRY OUT ITS OBJECTS BY FOCUSING ON THE GEOGRAPHIC COMMUNITY OF HITHER GREEN AND LEE GREEN IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM, AN AREA WHICH SUFFER FROM THE DISADVANTAGE OF SOCIAL EXCLUSION. THE CHARITY WILL USE FROM TIME TO TIME THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC INDICES OF DEPRIVATION (FOR EXAMPLE, THE INDICES OF DEPRIVATION 200) TO MEASURE THIS DISADVANTAGE IN THE GEOGRAPHIC COMMUNITY OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM. THE CHARITY WILL DEVELOP THE SKILLS AND CAPACITY OF MEMBERS BY ENCOURAGING GENERAL ACTIVITIES IN MUTUAL VOLUNTEERING, BEFRIENDING AND SOCIAL EVENTS, AS WELL AS SPECIFIC ACTIVITIES IN EDUCATION (THE PROMOTION OF CITIZENSHIP IN LOCAL SCHOOLS), THE ARTS, WRITING, COMPUTER USE, COOKERY, SEWING, HORTICULTURE, EXERCISE AND A GENERALLY HEALTHY LIFESTYLE. THE CHARITY WILL ACHIEVE ITS OBJECTS THROUGH THE EMPLOYMENT OF A MECHANISM THAT USED TIME AS CURRENCY. ONE HOUR WILL BE EQUAL TO ONE TIME CREDIT. THE BROKER WILL WORK IN THE COMMUNITY TO STIMULATE ACTIVITIES AND, USING A "TIME ON LINE" DATABASE, WILL RECORD ALL EXCHANGES OF TIME. THE CHARITY CAN MAKE A LOAN OF TIME CREDITS TO MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY WHO DO NOT HAVE TIME CREDITS AND CAN TAKE TIME CREDITS IN THE FORM OF DONATIONS FROM PEOPLE WHO HAVE A SURPLUS OF TIME CREDITS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Lee Green Community Centre
St Peter's Church Hall
Weigall Road
Lee
SE12 8HQ
- Phone:
- 07795981498
- Email:
- leefairshare@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window