DOG KENNEL HILL AP LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Object 1: The objects of the Charity are to provide facilities for recreation & other leisure occupations for children & young people resident in East Dulwich of which such children & young people have need by reason of their youth or social economic circumstances. Object 2: To impose the conditions of life for such young people promoting physical, social, mental and spiritual well-being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £30,213 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Southwark
Governance
- 17 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Teresa Rodriguez | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Allams | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Queen Asemota | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kerrie Hylton | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shaniqua Fletcher | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Peters | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah King | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Brady | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Canter | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA EGO OLISA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.26k | £66.94k | £55.39k | £74.40k | £58.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.84k | £73.91k | £66.27k | £65.84k | £53.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £5.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.70k | £38.10k | £36.25k | £30.21k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 SEPTEMBER 2004 as amended on 05 Jun 2019 as amended on 18 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE RESIDENT IN CHAMPION HILL AND ADJACENT WARDS OF WHICH SUCH CHILDREN AND SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND WHICH WILL IMPOSE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN AND SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING.
Area of benefit
EAST DULWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
DOG KENNEL HILL ADV. PLAYGROUND
DOG KENNEL HILL
EAST DULWICH
LONDON
SE22 7AA
- Phone:
- 02072746197
- Email:
- dkhap@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window