Accounts and annual returns TERRA SANCTA EDUCATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1122180
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 February 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required