Accounts and annual returns THE WILD ENGLAND FUND

Charity number: 1121837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 02 May 2025 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 02 May 2025 491 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 02 May 2025 856 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 06 April 2022 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 06 April 2022 463 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required