ANDOVER PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Andover Pre-school is a provider of Early Years Education for Children aged 2-5 year olds, mainly to local parents living on the Andover Estate and the surrounding neighbourhoods.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Islington
Governance
- 01 May 2008: Standard registration
- 09 January 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.17k | £66.32k | £68.28k | £83.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.95k | £74.47k | £76.54k | £79.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 06 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 25 March 2012 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 25 March 2012 | 419 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 28 June 2011 | 148 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 25 March 2012 | 784 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 07 July 2010 | 157 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION (ADOPTED) 22 MAY 2007
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON FINSBURY PARK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window