FROM HERE TO MATURITY DANCE COMPANY LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A dance company which works with older professional dancers and takes dance to older people in the community, including doing artistic work with professional and non-professional dancers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 April 2008: Standard registration
- 23 February 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.94k | £1.98k | £8.73k | £1.08k | £4.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.54k | £1.32k | £7.32k | £3.55k | £4.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 15 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 16 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 22 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 12 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE DANCE, PRIMARILY FOR THE BENEFIT OF ELDERLY PEOPLE AS PERFORMERS AND PARTICIPANTS; AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND DANCE AUDIENCES THROUGH INNOVATIVE DANCE WORK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window