CITY OF SHEFFIELD HATTERS BASKETBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a women and girls basketball club dedicated to achieving equality for females in sport and to provide opportunities for women and girls of all ages and abilities to play basketball and develop a healthy lifestyle. Our programme is designed to help all achieve their full potential, raise standards of health and well being and help them become responsible members of society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
31 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 09 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Naomi Campbell | Chair | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Matheroo | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Creswick | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Lowe | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Creswick | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Wright | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Brooks | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Waller | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Waller | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vivian Ajagbi | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Hancock | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah McQueen | Trustee | 01 September 2009 |
|
|
||||
LORAINE Davara GAYLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.39k | £42.40k | £87.18k | £96.41k | £65.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.42k | £15.06k | £80.94k | £84.19k | £65.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING THE GAME OF BASKETBALL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SOUTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cannon Medical Arena
Sheffield Olympic Legacy Park
Worksop Road
SHEFFIELD
S9 3TL
- Phone:
- 07482 412060
- Email:
- naomi@sheffieldhatters.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window