Financial history RANDER SUNNI VOHRA PANCHAYAT (UK)

Charity Number: 1124838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £120.06k £286.76k £315.25k £358.32k £25.17k
Total expenditure £100.81k £144.37k £277.58k £92.00k £16.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A