BRITISH SOCIETY FOR GYNAECOLOGICAL IMAGING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and encourage the study and application of all forms of imaging related to gynaecology, specifically to promote the well being of women's health through imaging.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR NEIL DAVID PUGH PHD, MIPEM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Eman Elkattan | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lukasz Polanski | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr GHADA SALMAN | Trustee | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Treharne | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Leena Satish Gokhale MSc, FRCOG | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR Jonathan Chamberlain | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH ISKAROS FRCOG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.85k | £6.37k | £5.69k | £20.10k | £21.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.32k | £1.22k | £6.04k | £6.28k | £23.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 October 2024 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 June 2023 | 341 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 February 2021 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED ON 7 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN WOMEN BY: 1 EDUCATING HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND PROMOTING GOOD PRACTICE IN GYNAECOLOGICAL IMAGING. 2 INCREASING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE BENEFITS OF ULTRASOUND SCANNING AND IMAGING IN CLINICAL PRACTICE AMONGST HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, SERVICE PROVIDERS AND THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Ffordd Gwern
St. Fagans
CARDIFF
CF5 6PB
- Phone:
- 07950342628
- Email:
- admin@bsgi.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window