ST THOMAS' COMMUNITY CONNECTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main ongoing activity is our Bus Project to help people living on Hallgarth Estate, who are unable to access public transport due to disability or vulnerability, with a weekly shopping service. We also run a Lunch Club for low income families during school holidays and support a local group for the elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 03 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev George Briggs | Chair | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
IVAN SMITH | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE HANDLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS JEAN THORP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.67k | £677 | £20.80k | £10.94k | £6.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.50k | £910 | £17.26k | £14.15k | £2.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF KENDAL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS. TO PROVIDE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE TO RELIEVE NEED, HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING.
Area of benefit
KENDAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST THOMAS CHURCH
STRICKLANDGATE
KENDAL
CUMBRIA
LA9 4QG
- Phone:
- 01539730683
- Email:
- cc@stkmail.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window