Accounts and annual returns BRANT BROUGHTON AND STRAGGLETHORPE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1122280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 18 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 18 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required