Financial history BRANT BROUGHTON AND STRAGGLETHORPE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1122280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £17.26k £24.74k £16.93k £14.83k £29.47k
Total expenditure £8.08k £19.27k £10.36k £14.40k £30.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.43k £18.33k £4.57k N/A £600