Harvest Alliance UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Two conferences are held each year to bring together leaders of churches and ministries linked to the charity for teaching, fellowship and mutual support. Trustees visit churches throughout the UK and Europe to support and encourage the leadership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 March 2008: Standard registration
- PARTNERS IN HARVEST (EUROPE) (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND RICHARD ERIC OLDLAND | Chair | 02 September 2011 |
|
|||||
CAROLINE LOUISE YOUNG | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|||||
JULIE OLDLAND | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Floutier | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Baines | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sherryll Anne Baines | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Brewster | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN YOUNG | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Michael Floutier | Trustee | 07 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN ROBERT SPENCER | Trustee | 18 August 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.15k | £27.45k | £30.07k | £45.19k | £39.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.35k | £25.86k | £37.83k | £59.53k | £42.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 FEBRUARY 2008 as amended on 23 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UK AND WORLD-WIDE AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO NETWORK WITH AND SUPPORT OTHER CHURCHES AND CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES WHO DO SO. B) TO OFFER RELIEF TO PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP, SICKNESS, AND ADDICTION AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE UK AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN THE UK AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, INCLUDING THE DEVELOPING OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING CENTRES FOR THE RESOURCING AND EQUIPPING OF PERSONS OF MINISTRY, MISSION AND CHRISTIAN LEADERSHIP IN THE UK AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. D) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UK OR THE WORLD WHERE THE CHARITY MAY BE OPERATING AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 2.3) THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 Shearwater Road
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Hertfordshire
HP3 0GB
- Phone:
- 07521 394517
- Email:
- mail@harvestalliance.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window