THE LEO AND BETTY GRUSS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was formed on 7 November 2007 during the lifetime of Leo and Betty Gruss. Their intention was to bequeath their estate to the charity. Betty Gruss died in 2018, Leo Gruss died in 2020. Probate was granted on the estate of Mr Gruss and the charity is the beneficiary of the residue of the estate. Trustees are working towards funding projects which will meet the charity's objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 04 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Naomi Greenwood | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW JAMES WOOTLIFF | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen North | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Cohen | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Levine | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £2.89m | £9.69k | £24.97k | £9.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £5.70k | £16.23k | £278.22k | £244.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £2.89m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £2.89m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £5.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £5.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE GIVING OF AND AFFORDING ASSISTANCE TO LARGE NEEDY FAMILIES AND NEEDY BRIDES. 2) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF THE JEWISH FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ORTHODOX PRACTICE. 3) TO ADVANCE JEWISH EDUCATION. 4) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW AS CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Keelings Ltd
Broad House
1 The Broadway
HATFIELD
Hertfordshire
AL9 5BG
- Phone:
- 07976708019
- Email:
- helen.rook@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window