Accounts and annual returns THAI WOMEN'S ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1121856
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2017 30 July 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 15 November 2017 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2015 23 September 2016 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 Not Required