Financial history THAI WOMEN'S ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1121856
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2013 31/10/2014 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017
Total gross income £3 £2.85k £0 £214 £49
Total expenditure £8.42k £13.66k £4.33k £1.65k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A