SIERRA LEONE SICKLE CELL DISEASE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Create, stimulate and foster public awareness of sickle cell disease in the UK and Sierra Leone. Educate private and public sectors about sickle cell disease Advocate in the care and support of sickle cell patients and their families Counsel sickle cell patients and their families Identify babies at risk of sickle cell by newborn screening Promote medical and social research on sickle cell.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 25 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GEORGE TREGSON ROBERTS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
George Stanley Johnson | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|||||
JOHN PETERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TUNU LOUISE TREGSON ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES KAREFA-SMART | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.43k | £30.93k | £20.97k | £11.97k | £2.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.85k | £31.99k | £15.06k | £17.31k | £1.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 08 September 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 28 October 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 28 October 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JULY 2007 AS AMENDED BY EXTRAORDINARY MEETING ON 2008 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HEALTH OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY SICKLE CELL DISORDER AND ANY RELATED CONDITION IN SIERRA LEONE, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD IN ANY MANNER DEEMED CHARITABLE AT LAW. 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION IN SIERRA LEONE, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD, IN THE SUBJECT OF SICKLE CELL AND ANY RELATED CONDITION.
Area of benefit
SIERRA LEONE, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 BELHAM WALK
LONDON
SE5 7DX
- Phone:
- 02072525904
- Email:
- gtr@sleonesickle.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window