HORSEWORLD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ensuring quality of life for horses ponies & donkeys by providing a healthy & secure future. Operating an effective rescue rehabilitation & rehoming programme actively promoting & encouranging responsible equine ownership. Supporting & working closely with local communities & organisations. Educating children with emotional behavioural & learning difficulties through our Discovery Programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,210,383
Donations and legacies | £1.91m | |
Charitable activities | £102.37k | |
Other trading activities | £48.48k | |
Investments | £142.24k | |
Other | £4.95k |
Total expenditure:
£2,212,261
Raising funds | £434.68k | |
Charitable activities | £1.78m | |
Other | £0 |
£249,514 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £434.68k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.78m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £434.68k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.78m | |
Retained for future use | £247.64k |
People

53 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 December 2007: Standard registration
- HOME OF REST FOR HORSES (Working name)
- HORSE WORLD (Working name)
- HORSEWORLD (Working name)
- HORSEWORLD WELFARE (Working name)
- REST HOME FOR HORSES (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF BRISTOL HORSES SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LESLIE BARBARA DILLINGHAM | Chair | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emmaline Pell | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Alicia White | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Cathryn Mitchell | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Duncan Graham Attwell | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robert Webb | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annette Katarina Newman | Trustee | 08 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Duncan John Ballard | Trustee | 08 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
KERRY GWYTHER | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL DANIEL | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|||||
ANDREW DOWDEN | Trustee | 04 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL NEALE | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN LOWTON NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.47m | £868.67k | £1.38m | £1.70m | £2.21m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50m | £1.62m | £1.93m | £2.24m | £2.21m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.12m | £627.99k | £1.11m | £1.41m | £1.91m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £58.62k | £34.49k | £55.00k | £43.13k | £48.48k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £82.55k | £37.10k | £56.60k | £72.77k | £102.37k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £178.61k | £150.91k | £160.53k | £157.44k | £142.24k | |
|
Income - Other | £30.14k | £18.19k | £0 | £16.71k | £4.95k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.02m | £425.35k | £775.15k | £1.04m | £1.66m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.16m | £1.26m | £1.50m | £1.72m | £1.78m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £341.01k | £360.21k | £428.10k | £518.69k | £434.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £247.49k | £95.80k | £283.09k | £333.44k | £339.13k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £750 | £27.25k | £3.06k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £18.03k | £22.75k | £28.17k | £26.23k | £22.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.75m | £3.73m | £3.80m | £3.90m | £3.82m | |
|
Long-term investments | £6.75m | £7.17m | £7.59m | £5.70m | £5.56m | |
|
Other assets | £1.70m | £872.85k | £682.57k | £1.27m | £1.85m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £60.78k | £91.03k | £156.88k | £109.64k | £229.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 AUG 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 DEC 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 FEB 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED (THE “OBJECTS”) ARE TO 1. RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF HORSES, DONKEYS AND OTHER EQUINES (AND IN EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES OTHER ANIMALS) THAT ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION FOR ANY REASON INCLUDING THOSE THAT ARE NEGLECTED OR UNWANTED THROUGH THE RESCUE, PROTECTION, TRAINING, REHABILITATION AND RE-HOMING OF SUCH ANIMALS; 2. ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS; 3. ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND MENTORING OF STUDENTS, YOUNG PERSONS AND DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND BEHAVIOURAL PROBLEMS) THROUGH, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PROVISION OF TRAINING COURSES, WORK EXPERIENCE, ASSISTING WITH AND PROVIDING PLACEMENT SCHEMES AND TRAINING AND SUPPORTING SUCH INDIVIDUALS GENERALLY; AND 4. PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PROTECTION, CONSERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND IN PARTICULAR LOCAL ANIMAL AND PLANT LIFE THROUGH THE CONSERVATION AND REGENERATION OF LOCAL LAND.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HORSEWORLD
DELMAR HALL
STAUNTON LANE
BRISTOL
BS14 0QL
- Phone:
- 01275832425
- Email:
- info@horseworld.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window