Financial history LEYBURN ARTS CENTRE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1122092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £72.03k £60.02k £76.71k £94.91k £87.27k
Total expenditure £64.86k £43.04k £54.67k £62.90k £81.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.30k
Income from government grants £2.56k £43.42k £27.37k £51.32k £1.00k