LEYBURN ARTS CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Film, theatre, art exhbition, meeting space for local community groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £7,300 from 1 government contract(s) and £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
62 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERTRAM ALLEN HARRISON | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ALEXANDER POOLE | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
JEANNIE ELIZABETH BISHOP | Trustee | 29 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANNE TERESA WOOD | Trustee | 29 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.03k | £60.02k | £76.71k | £94.91k | £87.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.86k | £43.04k | £54.67k | £62.90k | £81.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.30k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.56k | £43.42k | £27.37k | £51.32k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 20 April 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 20 April 2021 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
I) TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC ARTS PROVISION IN WENSLEYDALE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. II) TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF THE ARTS THROUGH EDUCATION AND PERFORMANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leyburn Arts & Community Centre
Richmond Road
LEYBURN
North Yorkshire
DL8 5DL
- Phone:
- 01969624510
- Email:
- admin@leyburnartscentre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window