THE FORK LIFT APPRENTICES TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the public, the advancement of education by providing support to colleges and young people in fork lift training for the maintenance of fork lift trucks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 February 2008: Standard registration
- 15 December 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £312 | £312 | £712 | £712 | £536 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 09 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED (DATED) 30TH JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TO COLLEGES AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN FORK LIFT TRAINING
Area of benefit
SCOTLAND, IRELAND AND NORTHERN IRELAND UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window