YOUTH WITH A MISSION, BOLIVIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth With A Mission Bolivia makes grants to a Bolivian charity to support 2 residential homes, 1 reception and 1 reintegration home in Bolivia where street children are provided with food, clothing, healthcare, education and vocational training. They also provide some healthcare and support to children living on the streets.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bolivia
Governance
- 30 April 2008: Standard registration
- YWAM, BOLIVIA - OPERATION RESTORATION (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER JOHN HULFORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Colin Taylor Gibson | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Eileen Thomas | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Louise Hulford-Wood | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suzanna Joy Stone | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Ruth Outram Procter | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.33k | £136.20k | £120.50k | £164.39k | £176.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.12k | £136.61k | £127.27k | £142.40k | £202.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STREET CHILDREN IN BOLIVIA. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN BOLIVIA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF CELEBRATIONS OF WORSHIP, BIBLICAL TEACHING AND PRAYER MEETINGS. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG STREET CHILDREN LIVING IN BOLIVIA BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS AND SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Area of benefit
BOLIVIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 15
Edgar Court
Sycamore Grove
NEW MALDEN
KT3 3DQ
- Phone:
- 07775789855
- Email:
- oprest@ywambolivia.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window