THE TINGEWICK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual pantomime performed by members of Oxford University medical school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 07 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harriet Dent | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Emmerson | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr AMANDA JANE SALISBURY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr DEREK EDWARD ROSKELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/04/2020 | 20/04/2021 | 20/04/2022 | 20/04/2023 | 20/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.79k | £24.21k | £0 | £42.97k | £28.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.53k | £24.21k | £0 | £42.90k | £28.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 April 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2024 | 28 April 2025 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 April 2022 | 21 March 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 April 2021 | 25 September 2022 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 April 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 20 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WILLIAM OSLER HOUSE
OSLER ROAD
HEADINGTON
OXFORD
OX3 9BL
- Phone:
- 0300 304 7777
- Email:
- treasurer@tingewick.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window