STEP (UK) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Step (UK) Ltd is an international development charity, working to improve the lives of vulnerable children in the Kurdish region of Iraq. We sponsor front-line work such as a children's drop-in centre and more strategic work such as the implementation of the first foster care policy in the region. We have also sponsored child protection projects in camps for refugees and displaced Iraqi people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Iraq
Governance
- 24 July 2008: Standard registration
- STEP UK 2007 LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Werner Nijman | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Ian Wilson | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MEGAN DALTON | Trustee | 29 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SUSANS | Trustee | 04 June 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £770.67k | £668.62k | £629.28k | £593.33k | £279.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £812.89k | £650.31k | £654.29k | £643.13k | £267.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £747.32k | £664.80k | £627.05k | £591.87k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £23.34k | £3.82k | £2.23k | £1.47k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £18.77k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £808.55k | £644.78k | £648.73k | £635.72k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £4.34k | £5.54k | £5.55k | £7.41k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.94k | £5.43k | £6.63k | £6.19k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JUNE 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 23 JUNE 2008. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 15 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
A) THE DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN THEIR SOCIETY. B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND ADULTS C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND ADULTS SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN THEIR EXISTING OR NEW COMMUNITY D) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND ADULTS E) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. F) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, OF "CARERS" WITHIN PROFESSIONAL BODIES, LAY PEOPLE AND THOSE WORKING WITHIN GOVERNMENT STRUCTURES IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES. G) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATION TO SUCH DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND ADULTS. SUCH WORK AMONG DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND ADULTS MAYBE UNDERTAKEN WORLD-WIDE, BUT A FOCUS WILL REMAIN ON AREAS AFFECTED BY WAR AND INTERNAL CONFLICTS RESULTING IN INCREASED POVERTY AND DISPLACEMENT
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATION AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 801
Southsea
PO1 9EJ
- Phone:
- 07881777417
- Email:
- info@step-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window