Financial history WINNING WOMEN WORLDWIDE

Charity number: 1123055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £11.46k £11.09k £7.49k £7.18k £6.10k
Total expenditure £10.65k £9.66k £8.46k £8.65k £8.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A