Accounts and annual returns ST EDMUNDS CATHOLIC SCHOOL WOLVERHAMPTON DEVELOPMENT FUND

Charity number: 1125089
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 June 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 June 2017 On Time