EDEN - ROSE COPPICE TRUST

Charity number: 1122514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our aim is the acquisition, management and protection of woodland and other natural sites to provide a free retreat for people living with critical illness. The Charity encourages and supports volunteers living with mental health difficulties with or without carers, to improve their condition. This is achieved through social involvement, education, skill acquisition and immersion in nature.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £64,052
Total expenditure: £58,404

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 January 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wendy Battye Patricia Chair 01 December 2015
None on record
Faye Harburt Trustee 26 July 2024
None on record
Dr Robert Brooks Trustee 14 January 2020
None on record
Maggie Butcher Trustee 25 March 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £150.06k £45.94k £78.60k £60.91k £64.05k
Total expenditure £56.41k £48.97k £50.30k £34.21k £58.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 30 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 30 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 18 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 18 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 07 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 July 2020 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 20 July 2020 50 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Brickmakers Wood
33 Back Hamlet
IPSWICH
IP3 8AH
Phone:
08007723755