Financial history THE HELEN MIDDLETON AFTER CARE FUND

Charity number: 1122710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/06/2020 01/06/2021 01/06/2022 01/06/2023 01/06/2024
Total gross income £102 £32.89k £76.15k £60.17k £1.42k
Total expenditure £16.57k £14.08k £17.43k £24.47k £81.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A