THE SONICA MUSIC FOUNDATION LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity delivers music based education initatives and bridge building projects to community's organisations and individuals in the Merseyside area. Some of these activities include music production techniques, music business analysis, and music in the digital age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 05 March 2008: Standard registration
- 09 July 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 July 2013: Re-registered
- 09 July 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2010 | 31/01/2011 | 31/01/2012 | 31/01/2013 | 31/01/2014 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2014 | 25 April 2015 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2013 | 24 January 2014 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE RESIDENT ON MERSEYSIDE AGED ABOVE 16 YEARS OF AGE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE ART AND SCIENCES OF MUSIC AND FILM PRODUCTION, AND IN THE BUSINESS SKILLS ASSOCIATED WITH SUCH PRODUCTION.
Area of benefit
LIVERPOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window