WEARDALE COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE RUN A COMMUNITY HUB OFFERING A ONE STOP SHOP FOR LOCAL TRANSPORT AND OTHER INFORMATION, SERVICE SIGN POSTING, COMPUTER AND CRAFT COURSES AND A UKONLINE CENTRE. THE HUB ALSO HOSTS THE WEARDALE COMMUNITY TRANSPORT OPERATION. WE HAVE BEEN RUNNING A PROJECT CALLED 'SONG AND DANCE' TO ENCOURAGE MUSIC, MOVEMENT AND SONG.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £40,847 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 14 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Janette Smith | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
Laura Lowes | Trustee | 28 August 2022 |
|
|||||||
William Hobson | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
|||||||
John Bell | Trustee | 25 July 2014 |
|
|||||||
PAMELA JOAN FORBES | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Julian Haynes | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.29k | £83.24k | £75.30k | £29.18k | £48.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.59k | £64.27k | £40.89k | £32.84k | £26.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £66.69k | £53.08k | £28.06k | £40.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 OCTOBER 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WEARDALE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") TOGETHER WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, DISABILITY OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, IMPROVE MOBILITY AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
WEARDALE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEARDALE HUB
85B FRONT STREET
STANHOPE
WEARDALE
COUNTY DURHAM
DL13 2UY
- Phone:
- 01388529500
- Email:
- wcp@the-wcp.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window