LONDON ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH PRACTITIONERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our work during the year is delivered in the context of our 5 operational themes of; Developing Partnerships; Policy and Strategy; Supporting Services, Learning and Building Capacity. Detailed information on our activities can be found in our annual report available form this site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £13,766 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Newman | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Edwards | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Armitage | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Pye | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
jonathan Averns | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
GAVIN FREDERICK DOUGLAS | Trustee | 06 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.00k | £64.10k | £64.63k | £103.93k | £105.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.63k | £84.79k | £88.64k | £99.76k | £103.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £25.00k | £46.47k | N/A | £13.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
TO HELP PROTECT AND IMPROVE THE ENVIRONMENT AND PUBLIC HEALTH IN LONDON FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL AND PUBLIC HEALTH MATTERS BY:- A) PROVIDING A POLICY AND STRATEGY FORUM FOR LONDON BOROUGH ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH MANAGERS AND STAFF TO DEVELOP AND DELIVER ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH SERVICES WITHIN LONDON; B) DEVELOPING AND DELIVERING AND PROMOTING THE PROVISION OF CO-ORDINATED ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH ACROSS LONDON; AND C) IDENTIFYING ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH TRAINING NEEDS AND DEVELOPING AND DELIVERING SUCH TRAINING.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
4th Floor
18 St Cross Street
London
- Phone:
- 07554425823
- Email:
- secretary@alehm.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window