FRIENDS OF SHEFFIELD MANOR LODGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.TO PROMOTE THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF SHEFFIELD MANOR LODGE AS A SITE OF HISTORICAL IMPORTANCE AND ARCHITECTURAL VALUE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF SHEFFIELD MANOR LODGE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 29 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Cook | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Sheila Elizabeth Dunstan | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Beatrice Greenfield | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
PATRICIA RUSSELL | Trustee | 02 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Carol Ann Jenkinson | Trustee |
|
||||||||
BARBARA ASHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANNE TEMPLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID TEMPLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.05k | £7.41k | £6.45k | £8.58k | £8.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.63k | £4.81k | £3.09k | £3.55k | £3.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 OCTOBER 2007 AS AMENDED ON 22 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF SHEFFIELD MANOR LODGE AS A SITE OF HISTORICAL IMPORTANCE AND ARCHITECTURAL VALUE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF SHEFFIELD MANOR LODGE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 HAWKSHEAD AVENUE
DRONFIELD WOODHOUSE
DRONFIELD
S18 8NB
- Phone:
- 01246415497
- Email:
- templeman4@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window